THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:01:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Diabetic Foot Clinic
310 Wellington Road
London
London Ontario N6C 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 432-9468
Fax: (519) 432-6266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 06 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.W.S. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thompson (CPSO#: 55543 )
Business Address: 310 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 4P4
(519) 432-9468

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Diabetic Foot Clinic
310 Wellington Road
London
London Ontario N6C 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 432-9468
Fax: (519) 432-6266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 06 Sep 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.W.S. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thompson (CPSO#: 55543 )
Business Address: 310 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 4P4
(519) 432-9468

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY WILLIAM ST. MAUR THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY WILLIAM ST. MAUR THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985