THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8351
Fax: (519) 646-6076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David P. Tingey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tingey (CPSO#: 55544 )
Business Address: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8351

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8351
Fax: (519) 646-6076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David P. Tingey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tingey (CPSO#: 55544 )
Business Address: Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8351

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL TINGEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINGEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL TINGEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TINGEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985