THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:38:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5412
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William J. Komer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Komer (CPSO#: 55555 )
Business Address: Suite 513
509 Commissioners Road West
London Ontario N6J 1Y5
(519) 670-4060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5412
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William J. Komer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Komer (CPSO#: 55555 )
Business Address: Suite 513
509 Commissioners Road West
London Ontario N6J 1Y5
(519) 670-4060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOSEPH KOMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOSEPH KOMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985