THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:19:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Dept. of CNS - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3236
Fax: (519) 663-3328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Nicolle, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nicolle (CPSO#: 55575 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3236

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Dept. of CNS - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3236
Fax: (519) 663-3328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Nicolle, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nicolle (CPSO#: 55575 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3236

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WADE NICOLLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WADE NICOLLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985