THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4190 Finch Ave. E., Ste 405
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-5666
Fax: 416-292-6733
Address: Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kwok Chu Man Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Man (CPSO#: 55608 )
Business Address: 106 Mary Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2P2
(905) 430-6795
Business Address: 405- 4190 Finch Ave., E.,
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
4162925666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4190 Finch Ave. E., Ste 405
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-292-5666
Fax: 416-292-6733
Address: Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kwok Chu Man Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Man (CPSO#: 55608 )
Business Address: 106 Mary Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2P2
(905) 430-6795
Business Address: 405- 4190 Finch Ave., E.,
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
4162925666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KWOK-CHU MAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KWOK-CHU MAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985