THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:36:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shepherd Dougherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shepherd (CPSO#: 55636 ) Dr. D. Dougherty (CPSO#: 53954 )
Business Address: 301 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 6H9
(519) 631-5670
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020

Corporation Name: L. Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shepherd Dougherty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Shepherd (CPSO#: 55636 ) Dr. D. Dougherty (CPSO#: 53954 )
Business Address: 301 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 6H9
(519) 631-5670
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020

Corporation Name: L. Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985