THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:35:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite C
190 St. David St S
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 787-0800
Fax: (519) 787-9902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Love Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Boswell (CPSO#: 55376 ) Dr. J. Love (CPSO#: 55637 )
Business Address: C-190 St. David Street South
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L3
(519) 787-0800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite C
190 St. David St S
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 787-0800
Fax: (519) 787-9902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Love Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Boswell (CPSO#: 55376 ) Dr. J. Love (CPSO#: 55637 )
Business Address: C-190 St. David Street South
Fergus Ontario N1M 2L3
(519) 787-0800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN RICHARD LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN RICHARD LOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985