THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume St
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Basinski (CPSO#: 55653 )
Business Address: 6 - 160 Beck Street
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 2K7
(705) 422-4020
Business Address: 2920 Concession 10 North Nottawasaga
Collingwood ON L9Y 3Y9
4164500840

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 459 Hume St
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
Collingwood ON L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Basinski (CPSO#: 55653 )
Business Address: 6 - 160 Beck Street
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 2K7
(705) 422-4020
Business Address: 2920 Concession 10 North Nottawasaga
Collingwood ON L9Y 3Y9
4164500840

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONI STANISLAW HILFERDING BASINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASINSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONI STANISLAW HILFERDING BASINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASINSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985