THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:54:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Anaesthesia
Sudbury Regional Hospital Corp
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-5492
Fax: (705) 523-6269
Address: Sorgini Eye Clinic
1351 Martindale Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4J7
Phone: (705) 523-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Barr Plastic Surgery Centre
205 Douglas Street,
Sudbury, Ontario
P3E 1E9
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1E9
Phone: (705) 523-4900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northface Centre For Dental Surgery
2037 Long Lake Road, Unit A9
Sudbury, Ontario
P3E 6J9
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6J9
Phone: 705-222-3223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Waide T. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lambert (CPSO#: 55665 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department Of Anaesthesia
Sudbury Regional Hospital Corp
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-5492
Fax: (705) 523-6269
Address: Sorgini Eye Clinic
1351 Martindale Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4J7
Phone: (705) 523-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Barr Plastic Surgery Centre
205 Douglas Street,
Sudbury, Ontario
P3E 1E9
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1E9
Phone: (705) 523-4900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northface Centre For Dental Surgery
2037 Long Lake Road, Unit A9
Sudbury, Ontario
P3E 6J9
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6J9
Phone: 705-222-3223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Waide T. Lambert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lambert (CPSO#: 55665 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAIDE THOMAS LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAIDE THOMAS LAMBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985