THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Division Of Thoracic Surgery
E2 124
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6835
Fax: (519) 667 6517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard A. Malthaner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malthaner (CPSO#: 55697 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room E2-124
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6835

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Division Of Thoracic Surgery
E2 124
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6835
Fax: (519) 667 6517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard A. Malthaner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malthaner (CPSO#: 55697 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room E2-124
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6835

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ADAM MALTHANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTHANER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ADAM MALTHANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTHANER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985