THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-6222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I.C. Jamieson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Jamieson (CPSO#: 55703 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-6222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I.C. Jamieson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Jamieson (CPSO#: 55703 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAIN CHARLES JAMIESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMIESON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAIN CHARLES JAMIESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMIESON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985