THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:42:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SLOVENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Bartley Drive
Toronto Ontario M4A 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 750-8149
Fax: (416) 750-8150

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Gasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gasser (CPSO#: 55726 )
Business Address: 28 Bartley Drive
Toronto Ontario M4A 1B8
(416) 750-8149

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SLOVENIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Bartley Drive
Toronto Ontario M4A 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 750-8149
Fax: (416) 750-8150

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Gasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gasser (CPSO#: 55726 )
Business Address: 28 Bartley Drive
Toronto Ontario M4A 1B8
(416) 750-8149

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH GASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASSER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH GASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASSER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985