THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4600 Highway 7 W.
Suite 250
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605-3884
Fax: (416) 745-3653
Address: 4610 Highway 7 ste 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gould Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gould (CPSO#: 55727 )
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 250
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 605-3884

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4600 Highway 7 W.
Suite 250
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 605-3884
Fax: (416) 745-3653
Address: 4610 Highway 7 ste 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gould Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gould (CPSO#: 55727 )
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7 West
Suite 250
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 605-3884

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL IRWIN GOULD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL IRWIN GOULD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985