THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:29:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3047A Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5A 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-279-4848
Fax: 905-279-6934
Address: 1900 Lakeshore Rd W
Mississauga ON L5J 1J7
Phone: 905 842 4848
Fax: 905 822 7800
Address: 1867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto Ontario M1E4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3560 Bathurst st
Toronto Ontario M6A2E1
Phone: 416 785 2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4640 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K5
Phone: 416 650 5217
Fax: 416 650 0583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Hershkop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hershkop (CPSO#: 55738 )
Business Address: Mississauga Treatment Centre
3047A Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5A 2G9
(905) 279-4848
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7363
Business Address: Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E9
(416) 785-2500
Business Address: 562 Spring Gate Blvd
Thornhill ON L4J 5B6
416 854 7618

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3047A Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5A 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-279-4848
Fax: 905-279-6934
Address: 1900 Lakeshore Rd W
Mississauga ON L5J 1J7
Phone: 905 842 4848
Fax: 905 822 7800
Address: 1867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto Ontario M1E4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3560 Bathurst st
Toronto Ontario M6A2E1
Phone: 416 785 2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4640 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M3N 2K5
Phone: 416 650 5217
Fax: 416 650 0583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Hershkop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hershkop (CPSO#: 55738 )
Business Address: Mississauga Treatment Centre
3047A Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5A 2G9
(905) 279-4848
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7363
Business Address: Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E9
(416) 785-2500
Business Address: 562 Spring Gate Blvd
Thornhill ON L4J 5B6
416 854 7618

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELDON IRA HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELDON IRA HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985