THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:41:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-80 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162226154
Fax: 4162248684
Address: 110-2 Robert Speck Pky
Mississauga ON L4Z 1H8
Phone: 9058977007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Altum Health
Toronto Western Hospital
3KDT
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5185
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Working Condition Program
Suite 415
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8699
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Todd Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Levy (CPSO#: 55742 )
Business Address: Suite 202
80 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 2H4
(416) 222-6154
Business Address: Sunnybrook Working Condition Program
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 415
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
(416) 967-8699
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Altum Health
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 3 KDT
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5185
Business Address: 2 Robert Speck Pky
Suite 110
Mississauga ON L4Z 1H8
905-897-7007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-80 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162226154
Fax: 4162248684
Address: 110-2 Robert Speck Pky
Mississauga ON L4Z 1H8
Phone: 9058977007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Altum Health
Toronto Western Hospital
3KDT
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5185
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Working Condition Program
Suite 415
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8699
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Todd Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Levy (CPSO#: 55742 )
Business Address: Suite 202
80 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 2H4
(416) 222-6154
Business Address: Sunnybrook Working Condition Program
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 415
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1H1
(416) 967-8699
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Altum Health
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 3 KDT
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5185
Business Address: 2 Robert Speck Pky
Suite 110
Mississauga ON L4Z 1H8
905-897-7007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TODD STEWART LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TODD STEWART LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985