THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:42:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Churchill Family Medical Centre
Unit 6
3080 Windwood Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 824-3700
Fax: (905) 824-9956

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judith Lane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lane (CPSO#: 55744 )
Business Address: 6 - 3080 Windwood Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2K2
(905) 824-3700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Churchill Family Medical Centre
Unit 6
3080 Windwood Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 824-3700
Fax: (905) 824-9956

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judith Lane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lane (CPSO#: 55744 )
Business Address: 6 - 3080 Windwood Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2K2
(905) 824-3700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH IRENE LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH IRENE LANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985