THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:43:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York-Med Medical Arts Buliding
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Weisbrot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Brill (CPSO#: 56969 ) Dr. J. Weisbrot (CPSO#: 55753 )
Business Address: York-Med Medical Arts Building
404 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York-Med Medical Arts Buliding
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Weisbrot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Brill (CPSO#: 56969 ) Dr. J. Weisbrot (CPSO#: 55753 )
Business Address: York-Med Medical Arts Building
404 - 250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAKOB WEISBROT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAKOB WEISBROT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985