THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Anesthesia
1E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #103 - 20 Wynford Drive
North York Ontario M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 639-2288
Fax: (416) 441-2114
Address: 300-243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3560 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 Finch Ave West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Kashin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kashin (CPSO#: 55755 )
Business Address: 251 Davenport Rd
FACE Clinic
Toronto ON M5R 1J9
888-684-7066
Business Address: 1188B Eglinton Ave W
Forest Hill Surgical Center
Toronto ON M6C 2E3
416-785-7864
Business Address: 9080 Yonge St
Grand Genesis Health
Level 2 Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
289-597-7676
Business Address: 225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N5
(416) 925-0113
Business Address: 345 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N5
(416) 391-4048
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst Street
North York Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2500
Business Address: 301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
(416) 486-8088
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6520
Business Address: 330 Highway 7 E
510
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
905-707-5007
Business Address: 200-4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
905-856-2626
Business Address: 700 Lawrence Ave W
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
647-812-2113

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Anesthesia
1E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: No Information Available
Address: #103 - 20 Wynford Drive
North York Ontario M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 639-2288
Fax: (416) 441-2114
Address: 300-243 Consumers Rd
North York ON M2J 4W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3560 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 555 Finch Ave West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Kashin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kashin (CPSO#: 55755 )
Business Address: 251 Davenport Rd
FACE Clinic
Toronto ON M5R 1J9
888-684-7066
Business Address: 1188B Eglinton Ave W
Forest Hill Surgical Center
Toronto ON M6C 2E3
416-785-7864
Business Address: 9080 Yonge St
Grand Genesis Health
Level 2 Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
289-597-7676
Business Address: 225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N5
(416) 925-0113
Business Address: 345 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M5R 3N5
(416) 391-4048
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst Street
North York Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2500
Business Address: 301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
(416) 486-8088
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6520
Business Address: 330 Highway 7 E
510
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
905-707-5007
Business Address: 200-4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
905-856-2626
Business Address: 700 Lawrence Ave W
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
647-812-2113

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN ARTHUR KASHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN ARTHUR KASHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985