THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 407
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-5292
Fax: (416) 431-4011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Azzopardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Azzopardi (CPSO#: 55757 )
Business Address: Suite 407
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 431-5292

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 407
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-5292
Fax: (416) 431-4011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 28 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Azzopardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Azzopardi (CPSO#: 55757 )
Business Address: Suite 407
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 431-5292

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOHN AZZOPARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZOPARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOHN AZZOPARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZOPARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985