THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 409
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 498-1555
Fax: (416) 498-9907
Address: 402-1100 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2K 2W1
Phone: 6472992592
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Dennis K Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu (CPSO#: 55810 )
Business Address: 6472992592

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis K. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 409
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 498-1555
Fax: (416) 498-9907
Address: 402-1100 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2K 2W1
Phone: 6472992592
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Dennis K Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chu (CPSO#: 55810 )
Business Address: 6472992592

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis K. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KWOK CHUN DENNIS CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KWOK CHUN DENNIS CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985