THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:59:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 North Mitton Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 337-0011
Fax: (519) 337-0522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Davies (CPSO#: 55843 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325
Business Address: 185 North Mitton Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6H3
(519) 337-0011
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 North Mitton Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 337-0011
Fax: (519) 337-0522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Davies (CPSO#: 55843 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325
Business Address: 185 North Mitton Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6H3
(519) 337-0011
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985