THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:08:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (905) 632 3730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zohra Docrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Docrat (CPSO#: 55852 )
Business Address: 1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3730

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 (905) 632 3730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zohra Docrat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Docrat (CPSO#: 55852 )
Business Address: 1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
(905) 632-3730

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZOHRA DOCRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCRAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZOHRA DOCRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCRAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985