THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:06:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Pediatrics
Children's Hospital
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West, Room 3N10
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73687
Fax: (905) 522-7982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Niec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Niec (CPSO#: 55853 )
Business Address: Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital
McMaster University
3N10 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Pediatrics
Children's Hospital
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West, Room 3N10
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73687
Fax: (905) 522-7982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Niec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Niec (CPSO#: 55853 )
Business Address: Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital
McMaster University
3N10 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE CHRISTINE NIEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE CHRISTINE NIEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985