THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 634-9012
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Cuddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cuddy (CPSO#: 55861 )
Business Address: Suite 100
672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
(905) 634-9012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 634-9012
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Cuddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cuddy (CPSO#: 55861 )
Business Address: Suite 100
672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
(905) 634-9012

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOSEPH CUDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUDDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOSEPH CUDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUDDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985