THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Hose and Peter Photopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Photopoulos (CPSO#: 62502 ) Dr. P. Hose (CPSO#: 55865 )
Business Address: Suite 805
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto Ontario M8X 1Y9
(647) 256-3111
Business Address: 11 Woodside Ave
Toronto ON M6P 1L6
647-256-3111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Hose and Peter Photopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Photopoulos (CPSO#: 62502 ) Dr. P. Hose (CPSO#: 55865 )
Business Address: Suite 805
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto Ontario M8X 1Y9
(647) 256-3111
Business Address: 11 Woodside Ave
Toronto ON M6P 1L6
647-256-3111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARY HOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARY HOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985