THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Sanatorium Rd
Unit 102
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-318-1444
Fax: 905-318-0062

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ravinderpal Singh Ohson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ohson (CPSO#: 55912 )
Business Address: 505 Rymal Road East
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3X1
(905) 318-1444
Business Address: 565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5K8
905-318-1444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Sanatorium Rd
Unit 102
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-318-1444
Fax: 905-318-0062

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ravinderpal Singh Ohson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ohson (CPSO#: 55912 )
Business Address: 505 Rymal Road East
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3X1
(905) 318-1444
Business Address: 565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5K8
905-318-1444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVINDER PAL SINGH OHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVINDER PAL SINGH OHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985