THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:17:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-377 Church St
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 554-8711
Fax: (905) 554-8815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale K. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson (CPSO#: 55952 )
Business Address: 207 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 554-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207-377 Church St
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 554-8711
Fax: (905) 554-8815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale K. Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson (CPSO#: 55952 )
Business Address: 207 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 554-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE KEITH ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE KEITH ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1985