THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:22:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 2212 D
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 813-7453
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Address: Darling Home for Kids
5657 15th Sideroad
Milton Ontario L9T 2X7
Phone: (905) 878-7673
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheelagh M. Kemp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kemp (CPSO#: 55955 )
Business Address: 150 Kilgaur Road
East York Ontario M4G 1R8
(416) 425-6220 Extn: 3465
Business Address: 565715th Sideroad
Milton Ontario L9E 0C8
(905) 878-7673
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Suite 2212D
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7453

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 2212 D
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 813-7453
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Address: Darling Home for Kids
5657 15th Sideroad
Milton Ontario L9T 2X7
Phone: (905) 878-7673
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheelagh M. Kemp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kemp (CPSO#: 55955 )
Business Address: 150 Kilgaur Road
East York Ontario M4G 1R8
(416) 425-6220 Extn: 3465
Business Address: 565715th Sideroad
Milton Ontario L9E 0C8
(905) 878-7673
Business Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Suite 2212D
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7453

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEELAGH MARGARET KEMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEELAGH MARGARET KEMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1985