THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:03:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department Medical Imaging
Rm 160
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 3900
Fax: (416) 480-5855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 May 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Glanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glanc (CPSO#: 55972 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging, NG160
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3900
Business Address: 37 Ridge Hill Drive
Toronto Ontario M6C 3A3
4166662262

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Corporation Name: Glanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department Medical Imaging
Rm 160
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 3900
Fax: (416) 480-5855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 May 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Glanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Glanc (CPSO#: 55972 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging, NG160
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3900
Business Address: 37 Ridge Hill Drive
Toronto Ontario M6C 3A3
4166662262

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Corporation Name: Glanc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHYLLIS GLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLANC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHYLLIS GLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLANC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985