THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055226237
Extension: 2451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie L. Bowen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bowen (CPSO#: 56039 )
Business Address: N E Ontario Regional Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-6237 Extn: 2451

Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Oct 2016

Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jul 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055226237
Extension: 2451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie L. Bowen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bowen (CPSO#: 56039 )
Business Address: N E Ontario Regional Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-6237 Extn: 2451

Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Oct 2016

Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jul 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE LYNN BOWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE LYNN BOWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Apr 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 1990

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985