THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:04:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
H5
Department of Mental Health
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: 416-469-6805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Fishman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fishman (CPSO#: 56046 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
H5
Department of Mental Health
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: 416-469-6805

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Fishman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fishman (CPSO#: 56046 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN DANIEL FISHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN DANIEL FISHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985