THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St Joseph's Healthcare
Firestone institute for Respiratory Health
Room T2123
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 35003
Fax: 9053888801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Gerard Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cox (CPSO#: 56056 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6

Corporation Name: P. Gerard Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St Joseph's Healthcare
Firestone institute for Respiratory Health
Room T2123
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 35003
Fax: 9053888801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Gerard Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cox (CPSO#: 56056 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6

Corporation Name: P. Gerard Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK GERARD COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK GERARD COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985