THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:26:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 8336
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Leary (CPSO#: 57549 ) Dr. K. O'Brien (CPSO#: 56139 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia UHN-MSH
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3459
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8336

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 8336
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Leary (CPSO#: 57549 ) Dr. K. O'Brien (CPSO#: 56139 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia UHN-MSH
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3459
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8336

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1985