THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:06:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical Health Centre
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: 905 836-1683
Address: Southlake Regional Health
Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mulera-Kwehangaana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mulera-Kwehangaana (CPSO#: 56143 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SWAHILI
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Medical Health Centre
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: 905 836-1683
Address: Southlake Regional Health
Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mulera-Kwehangaana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mulera-Kwehangaana (CPSO#: 56143 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS MULERA-KWEHANGAANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULERA-KWEHANGAANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS MULERA-KWEHANGAANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULERA-KWEHANGAANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Makerere Univ, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1985