THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M-1 Dermatology
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Address: 400 Bradwick Drive
#200
Thornhill ON L4K 5V9
Phone: 9056952020
Fax: 9056953800
Address: St. Michael's Occupational
36 Toronto st
7th floor Suite 700
Toronto Ontario M5C 2C5
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: (416) 864-5421

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Community Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel DeKoven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeKoven (CPSO#: 56171 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M1 Dermatology
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4908

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M-1 Dermatology
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Address: 400 Bradwick Drive
#200
Thornhill ON L4K 5V9
Phone: 9056952020
Fax: 9056953800
Address: St. Michael's Occupational
36 Toronto st
7th floor Suite 700
Toronto Ontario M5C 2C5
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: (416) 864-5421

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Community Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel DeKoven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. DeKoven (CPSO#: 56171 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M1 Dermatology
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4908

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL GLENN DEKOVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEKOVEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL GLENN DEKOVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEKOVEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1985