THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Branson Division
555 Finch Ave West,
2 North, Room 256
Toronto, M2R 1N5
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-632-8708
Extension: 6381
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Zare Parsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zare Parsi (CPSO#: 56180 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
(905) 881-0264

Corporation Name: A.Oshidari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oshidari (CPSO#: 64671 ) Dr. M. Zare Parsi (CPSO#: 56180 )
Business Address: Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
(905) 881-0264

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Branson Division
555 Finch Ave West,
2 North, Room 256
Toronto, M2R 1N5
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-632-8708
Extension: 6381
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Zare Parsi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zare Parsi (CPSO#: 56180 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
(905) 881-0264

Corporation Name: A.Oshidari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oshidari (CPSO#: 64671 ) Dr. M. Zare Parsi (CPSO#: 56180 )
Business Address: Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
(905) 881-0264

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOJGAN ZARE PARSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARE PARSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOJGAN ZARE PARSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARE PARSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1985