THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:52:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Calabogie Medical Centre
P O Box 40
Calabogie Ontario K0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 752-2323
Fax: (613) 752-2323
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-0911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Max Buxton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Buxton (CPSO#: 56326 )
Business Address: Calabogie Medical Centre
1101 Francis Street
P.O. Box 40
Calabogie Ontario K0J 1H0
(613) 752-2323
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Calabogie Medical Centre
P O Box 40
Calabogie Ontario K0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 752-2323
Fax: (613) 752-2323
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-0911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Max Buxton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Buxton (CPSO#: 56326 )
Business Address: Calabogie Medical Centre
1101 Francis Street
P.O. Box 40
Calabogie Ontario K0J 1H0
(613) 752-2323
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT MAXWELL BUXTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUXTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT MAXWELL BUXTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUXTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1985