THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 6222
Fax: (905) 721-6101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dixon (CPSO#: 56336 )
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811
Business Address: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 2802
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 6222
Fax: (905) 721-6101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dixon (CPSO#: 56336 )
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811
Business Address: Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 2802
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER FREDERICK DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER FREDERICK DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2001

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1985
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1985