THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:00:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 73955
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 08 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glen Goss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Goss (CPSO#: 56446 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Extension: 73955
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 08 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glen Goss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Goss (CPSO#: 56446 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLENWOOD DILLON GOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLENWOOD DILLON GOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1985
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1985