THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:43:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, TIGRIGNA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1670 Dufferin Street
Suite 205
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 539-9002
Fax: (416) 539-0309

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Efrem Alemayehu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Alemayehu (CPSO#: 56493 )
Business Address: 205 - 1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M2
(416) 539-9002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, TIGRIGNA
Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1670 Dufferin Street
Suite 205
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 539-9002
Fax: (416) 539-0309

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Efrem Alemayehu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Alemayehu (CPSO#: 56493 )
Business Address: 205 - 1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M6H 3M2
(416) 539-9002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EFREM ALEMAYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEMAYEHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EFREM ALEMAYEHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEMAYEHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1986
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1986