THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 91130
2901 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 493-3611
Fax: (416) 491-6428

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. M. Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jackson (CPSO#: 56555 )
Business Address: 2901 Bayview Avenue
PO Box 91130
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
(416) 493-3611
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 91130
2901 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 493-3611
Fax: (416) 491-6428

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. M. Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jackson (CPSO#: 56555 )
Business Address: 2901 Bayview Avenue
PO Box 91130
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
(416) 493-3611
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERVYN MAURICE JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERVYN MAURICE JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1986
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1986