THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:21:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Urology/ Surgery
Postal Code: L4M 6M2
Barrie Ontario L4M 7B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-937-545-8656
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiva R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh (CPSO#: 56649 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 113 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(519) 344-2949
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Urology
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Urology/ Surgery
Postal Code: L4M 6M2
Barrie Ontario L4M 7B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-937-545-8656
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 15 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiva R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh (CPSO#: 56649 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 113 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(519) 344-2949
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Urology
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIVA RANJAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIVA RANJAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 1986
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 1986