THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Sherway Drive
Suite 311
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-1100
Fax: (416) 622-0786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. D. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Panjwani (CPSO#: 56659 )
Business Address: 190 Sherway Drive
311
Toronto Ontario M9C 5N2

Corporation Name: Dr. D.D. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Pune, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Sherway Drive
Suite 311
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 622-1100
Fax: (416) 622-0786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. D. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Panjwani (CPSO#: 56659 )
Business Address: 190 Sherway Drive
311
Toronto Ontario M9C 5N2

Corporation Name: Dr. D.D. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILKHUSH DHANJIBHAI PANJWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANJWANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILKHUSH DHANJIBHAI PANJWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANJWANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1986