THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:19:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6731
Fax: (416) 480-6757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Binhammer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Binhammer (CPSO#: 56725 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6731

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6731
Fax: (416) 480-6757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Binhammer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Binhammer (CPSO#: 56725 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6731

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW BINHAMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINHAMMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW BINHAMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINHAMMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986