THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:32:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 106
North York Ontario M3N 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 739-7558
Fax: (416) 739-7601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harold Borenstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Borenstein (CPSO#: 56729 )
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: Suite 106
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2Z9
(416) 739-7558
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
(416) 658-2241

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 106
North York Ontario M3N 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 739-7558
Fax: (416) 739-7601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harold Borenstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Borenstein (CPSO#: 56729 )
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: Suite 106
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York Ontario M3N 2Z9
(416) 739-7558
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
(416) 658-2241

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAROLD BERNARD BORENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORENSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAROLD BERNARD BORENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986