THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 305-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-745-3117
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Corinne Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dixon (CPSO#: 56751 )
Business Address: 305-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
519-745-3117

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 305-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-745-3117
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Corinne Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dixon (CPSO#: 56751 )
Business Address: 305-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
519-745-3117

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINNE EVELYN DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINNE EVELYN DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1986