THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:54:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huronia Medical Centre
240 Penetanguishene Road
Suite 200
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-5825
Fax: (705) 526-0239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grundmanis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grundmanis (CPSO#: 56771 )
Business Address: Huronia Medical Centre
200 - 240 Penetanguishene Road
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-8351

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huronia Medical Centre
240 Penetanguishene Road
Suite 200
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-5825
Fax: (705) 526-0239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grundmanis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grundmanis (CPSO#: 56771 )
Business Address: Huronia Medical Centre
200 - 240 Penetanguishene Road
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-8351

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKUS ARVID GRUNDMANIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUNDMANIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARKUS ARVID GRUNDMANIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRUNDMANIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986