THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 04:37:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 723-1653
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Young Street
New Tecumseth Ontario L9R 0E9
Phone: 705-434-0074
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Sheppard Ave East Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Phone: 416-930-3055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 398 Steeles Avenue West
11-14
Vaughan Ontario L4J 6X3
Phone: 905-881-0334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marlon Hershkop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hershkop (CPSO#: 56780 )
Business Address: Oshawa Nuclear Medicine Clinic
201 - 300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(905) 723-1653

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 723-1653
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117 Young Street
New Tecumseth Ontario L9R 0E9
Phone: 705-434-0074
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Sheppard Ave East Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Phone: 416-930-3055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 398 Steeles Avenue West
11-14
Vaughan Ontario L4J 6X3
Phone: 905-881-0334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marlon Hershkop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hershkop (CPSO#: 56780 )
Business Address: Oshawa Nuclear Medicine Clinic
201 - 300 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K1
(905) 723-1653

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLON SIDNEY HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLON SIDNEY HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986