THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 12:59:39 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Geriatrics, H-G69
2075 Bayview Ave
M4N 3N5
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480-4076
Fax: 416 480 4778
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network
550 University Ave
Musculoskeletal Program
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 4514
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Villa Colombo Home for the Aged
40 Playfair Ave
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6B 2P9
Phone: 416-663-4124
Fax: 416 663 2200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Giovanni Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Marotta (CPSO#: 56831 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab Institute
550 Univeristy Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 4514
Business Address: Suite 203
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 663-4124
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences
HG69 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 4076

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Geriatrics, H-G69
2075 Bayview Ave
M4N 3N5
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480-4076
Fax: 416 480 4778
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network
550 University Ave
Musculoskeletal Program
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 4514
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Villa Colombo Home for the Aged
40 Playfair Ave
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6B 2P9
Phone: 416-663-4124
Fax: 416 663 2200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Giovanni Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Marotta (CPSO#: 56831 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab Institute
550 Univeristy Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 4514
Business Address: Suite 203
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 663-4124
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences
HG69 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 4076

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIOVANNI CARMINE MAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIOVANNI CARMINE MAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986