THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:21:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Dr.
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Phone: No Information Available
Extension: (416) 259-6671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre - Credit Valley Site
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura L. McConnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McConnell (CPSO#: 56834 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - Credit Valley Site
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Dr.
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Phone: No Information Available
Extension: (416) 259-6671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Trillium Health Centre - Credit Valley Site
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura L. McConnell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McConnell (CPSO#: 56834 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre - Credit Valley Site
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA LAINE MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA LAINE MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1986